This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 11/26/2022 at 05:13:49 (UTC).

ELITE IMAGING, LLC vs. ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 ELITE IMAGING, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALONZO, EDMOND W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3509

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALONZO, EDMOND W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELITE IMAGING, LLC

Defendant

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN, GREGORY EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

FERNANDEZ, MATTHEW L

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/26/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

9/26/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

9/26/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS ISSUED

9/27/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE

10/17/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE

MOTION TO DISMISS

10/27/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/27/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO DISMISS

10/27/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/3/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

11/3/2022: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/3/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/3/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Judge: ALONZO, EDMOND W; Location: Courtroom K - SC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT ATTORNEY: FERNANDEZ, MATTHEW L ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: GUDIN, GREGORY EDWARD - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022SC003509, ELITE IMAGING, LLC VS. ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-9/27/2022"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/30/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN K/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ALONZO, EDMOND W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND W: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: GUDIN, GREGORY EDWARD ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/27/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022SC003509

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $90.00 RECEIPT #2022000075665 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 158120228 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20220927235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Elite Imaging LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERNANDEZ , MATTHEW LOUIS