This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 11/14/2021 at 12:09:00 (UTC).

DURAN, JUDITH vs. SAFE, LEONARDO

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 DURAN, JUDITH filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against SAFE, LEONARDO. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2180

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DURAN, JUDITH

Respondent

SAFE, LEONARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DADAN, SASHA GYSEMIA

Respondent Attorney

MCENERY, STEPHANIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2021
  • DocketAttorney STEPHANIE MCENERY - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2021
  • DocketAttorney SASHA GYSEMIA DADAN - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL/DISSOLVE FINAL INJUNCTION OF PROTECTION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4679.669 / 4919122) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • HearingEvent: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE HEARING; Judge: GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L; Location: Courtroom 4A - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: DADAN, SASHA GYSEMIA; MCENERY, STEPHANIE; DURAN, JUDITH - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021DR002180, DURAN, JUDITH VS. SAFE, LEONARDO - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: ODDFINJ-9/2/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL/DISSOLVE FINAL INJUNCTION OF PROTECTION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketORDER TO BE SERVED TO SHERIFF ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021DR002180, DURAN, JUDITH VS. SAFE, LEONARDO - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: PTN-8/13/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketSTEPS IN OBTAINING AN INJUNCTION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COURT COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/16/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021DR002180

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COURT COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCENERY, STEPHANIE