This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/25/2023 at 03:10:55 (UTC).

DNF ASSOCIATES LLC vs. IUVARA, FRANK

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 DNF ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against IUVARA, FRANK. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ISENHOWER, DARYL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0108

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ISENHOWER, DARYL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DNF ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

IUVARA, FRANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/11/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

1/11/2023: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

1/11/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS ISSUED

1/12/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE-STANDARD INSTRUCTIONS FOR ZOOM HEARING

1/12/2023: NOTICE-STANDARD INSTRUCTIONS FOR ZOOM HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Judge: ISENHOWER, DARYL; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: LOTANE, TROY R - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2023SC000108, DNF ASSOCIATES LLC VS. IUVARA, FRANK - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-1/12/2023,NTC-1/12/2023"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE-STANDARD INSTRUCTIONS FOR ZOOM HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 02/27/2023 AT 1:30 PM IN VTR/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: LOTANE, TROY R ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023000003210 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 164516574 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20230112235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/11/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023SC000108

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less