This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/04/2020 at 22:40:01 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK vs. RIOS, ERNESTO

Case Summary

On 10/01/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RIOS, ERNESTO. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1876

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

RIOS, ERNESTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ( V )

2/3/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ( V )

DEFAULT ( V )

11/22/2019: DEFAULT ( V )

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

11/20/2019: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK ( V )

11/20/2019: DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT ( V )

11/20/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

10/3/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

10/1/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

9/28/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/28/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

9/28/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketAttorney SARAH CATHERINE DALEY - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: RAUSCH STURM - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA001876, DISCOVER BANK VS. RIOS, ERNESTO - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: DEF-11/22/2019"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000080791; Applied Amount; $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA001876, DISCOVER BANK VS. RIOS, ERNESTO - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-10/1/2019"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE METZGER, ELIZABETH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/01/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA001876

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019000080791 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 96454323 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20191001235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2019
  • DocketNOTICE CONF INFO ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less