This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/11/2020 at 15:39:18 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK vs. FRYE, AARON C

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FRYE, AARON C. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1766

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

FRYE, AARON C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHARLET, CHRISTINA N

ZEIGERMAN, MICHAEL JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT DENIED ( V )

11/27/2019: DEFAULT DENIED ( V )

CERTIFICATE - CERTIFICATION OF PLTF'S ATTORNEY ( V )

11/26/2019: CERTIFICATE - CERTIFICATION OF PLTF'S ATTORNEY ( V )

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

11/26/2019: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ( V )

11/26/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ( V )

ORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

10/24/2019: ORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

10/11/2019: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

9/26/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

9/12/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/11/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

9/11/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

9/11/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: ZEIGERMAN, MICHAEL JONATHAN - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA001766, DISCOVER BANK VS. FRYE, AARON C - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: MDCD-11/27/2019"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT DENIED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - CERTIFICATION OF PLTF'S ATTORNEY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000075420; Applied Amount; $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: CHARLET, CHRISTINA N. - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA001766, DISCOVER BANK VS. FRYE, AARON C - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-9/12/2019"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: ZEIGERMAN, MICHAEL JONATHAN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE METZGER, ELIZABETH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/12/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA001766

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019000075420 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 95561795 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20190912235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less