This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/07/2021 at 13:24:24 (UTC).

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY vs. HARRIS, ANDREW

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HARRIS, ANDREW. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1405

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

HARRIS, ANDREW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SAVAGE, ROBERT KEVIN

VILLOCH, ALFRED III

Defendant Attorney

LAWSON, RUSH DENMAN

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4505.1582 / 4778419) ( V )

11/10/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4505.1582 / 4778419) ( V )

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM ( V )

11/9/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT ( V )

11/9/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

10/21/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

10/19/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

10/2/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

9/21/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/18/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

9/18/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

9/18/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketAttorney RUSH DENMAN LAWSON - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketAttorney ROBERT KEVIN SAVAGE - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketAttorney ALFRED VILLOCH III - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4505.1582 / 4778419) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: METZGER, ELIZABETH A; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 10/30/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN VTR/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: METZGER, ELIZABETH A

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000065747; Applied Amount; $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: SAVAGE, ROBERT KEVIN - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CA001405, DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS. HARRIS, ANDREW - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-9/21/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE METZGER, ELIZABETH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: SAVAGE, ROBERT KEVIN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020000065747 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 113612337 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200921235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/18/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001405

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Direct General Insurance Company is a litigant