This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/22/2023 at 14:16:58 (UTC).

DIFRANCESCO, STEVEN vs. MORALES, MICHELLE

Case Summary

On 08/22/2013 DIFRANCESCO, STEVEN filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against MORALES, MICHELLE. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALSH, THOMAS J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1893

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALSH, THOMAS J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIFRANCESCO, STEVEN

Defendant

MORALES, MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

8/22/2013: COMPLAINT

EVICTION SUMMONS

8/22/2013: EVICTION SUMMONS

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

8/23/2013: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION

6/30/2014: NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

9/2/2014: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

10/15/2014: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.3681.1862 / 4004791)

10/16/2014: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.3681.1862 / 4004791)

 

Docket Entries

10/16/2014
View Court Documents

DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.3681.1862 / 4004791)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2014

HearingEvent: LACK OF PROSECUTION; Judge: WALSH, THOMAS J; Location: Courtroom L - SC; Result: DISPOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2014

DocketCASE CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2014
View Court Documents

DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2014
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2014

DocketNOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 10/15/2014 AT 10:00 AM IN L/ , COUNTY JUDGE: WALSH, THOMAS J

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2014
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2013
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2013
View Court Documents

DocketEVICTION SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2013

DocketPAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2013000080817

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2013
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2013

DocketCOUNTY JUDGE WALSH, THOMAS J: ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2013

DocketEACH DEFT OVER 5-CNTY CIVIL ASSESSED $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2013

DocketTENANT EVICTION ASSESSED $185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2013

DocketSUMMONS-CNTY CIVIL ASSESSED $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2013

DocketCASE FILED 08/22/2013 CASE NUMBER 2013CC001893

[+] Read More [-] Read Less