This case was last updated from St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/24/2023 at 12:14:47 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY vs. THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES ASSIGNEES

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES ASSIGNEES. This case was filed in St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0318

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

Defendants

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES ASSIGNEES

KEMP, CAROL

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CAROL KEMP

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC AS NOMINEE FOR WMC MORTGAGE CORP

MURRAY, TRENISE M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STARASOLER, TRACY

Defendant Attorney

FINNEY, LINNES JR.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

2/24/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

2/24/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE

2/23/2023: CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE

SUMMONS ISSUED

2/24/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

2/23/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS ISSUED

2/24/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

2/23/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

2/23/2023: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

LIS PENDENS

2/23/2023: LIS PENDENS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - RECORDED (OTHER.4988.1942. / 5191148)

5/12/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - RECORDED (OTHER.4988.1942. / 5191148)

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

5/10/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

5/10/2023: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

AFFIDAVIT

5/4/2023: AFFIDAVIT

SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED

5/2/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

5/2/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

4/27/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

4/27/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

3/27/2023: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - RECORDED (OTHER.4988.1942. / 5191148)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketPAYMENT $27.00 RECEIPT #2023000040282 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 172809474 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20230511235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/23/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023CA000318

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less