Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/22/2021 at 03:07:10 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY vs. EGGLESTON, RICHARD M

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against EGGLESTON, RICHARD M. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0656

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RICHARD M EGGLESTON

EGGLESTON, RICHARD M

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

MTG MASTERS OF THE TREASURE COAST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRAVIESO, JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

LIS PENDENS - Recorded (Other.4588.530 / 4845300)

4/9/2021: LIS PENDENS - Recorded (Other.4588.530 / 4845300)

COMPLAINT

4/8/2021: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

4/8/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

4/8/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

4/8/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

4/8/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

4/8/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

4/8/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

4/8/2021: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

LIS PENDENS

4/8/2021: LIS PENDENS

VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

4/8/2021: VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/8/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2021000028477; Applied Amount; $960.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS - Recorded (Other.4588.530 / 4845300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: TRAVIESO, JENNIFER - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CA000656, DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FO VS. EGGLESTON, RICHARD M - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-4/8/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: TRAVIESO, JENNIFER ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE METZGER, ELIZABETH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 04/08/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CA000656

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $960.00 RECEIPT #2021000028477 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 124557514 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20210408235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENNIFER TRAVIESO