This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 01/02/2021 at 06:48:04 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY TR vs. VELASQUEZ, KARLA

Case Summary

On 07/19/2012 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY TR filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against VELASQUEZ, KARLA. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2875

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY TR

Defendants

VELASQUEZ, KARLA

CHASE BANK USA

Not Yet Classified

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOHAMMED, HEIDI

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

6/3/2015: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

CERTIFICATE OF SALE

5/21/2015: CERTIFICATE OF SALE

NOTICE OF SALE

4/21/2015: NOTICE OF SALE

CIVIL NON-JURY TRIAL FORM

2/16/2015: CIVIL NON-JURY TRIAL FORM

NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION/CHANGE OF COUNSEL

9/8/2014: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION/CHANGE OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF TRIAL

9/8/2014: NOTICE OF TRIAL

ORDER PLACING CASE ON INACTIVE STATUS

9/4/2014: ORDER PLACING CASE ON INACTIVE STATUS

NTC OF DROPPING PARTY DEFT(S)

11/21/2012: NTC OF DROPPING PARTY DEFT(S)

VALUE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM

7/19/2012: VALUE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM

FORECLOSURE SALE SHEET

5/19/2015: FORECLOSURE SALE SHEET

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

5/1/2015: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEYS FEES

2/18/2015: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEYS FEES

AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY

2/18/2015: AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS - ORIG NOTE AND ORIG MTG

2/17/2015: NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS - ORIG NOTE AND ORIG MTG

NOTICE FILING DISCHARGE OF DEBTOR

9/8/2014: NOTICE FILING DISCHARGE OF DEBTOR

COMPLIANCE

4/22/2013: COMPLIANCE

CLERK DEFAULT ENTERED:KARLA VELASQUEZ UNKNOWN TENANT #1 NKA JANE DOE CHASE BANK USA, N.A.

11/28/2012: CLERK DEFAULT ENTERED:KARLA VELASQUEZ UNKNOWN TENANT #1 NKA JANE DOE CHASE BANK USA, N.A.

COMLAINT MF > 50,000 < 250,000

7/19/2012: COMLAINT MF > 50,000 < 250,000

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney HEIDI MOHAMMED - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE - Recorded (OR.3752.2984 / 4076973)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2015000048021; Applied Amount; $1,017.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • HearingEvent: FORECLOSURE SALE; Judge: FORECLOSURE SALE; Location: stlucie.clerkauction.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketDOC STAMPS ASSESSED $887.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SALE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE - PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNTC OF DROPPING PARTY DEFT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2012321124353; Applied Amount; $961.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNTC OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMLAINT MF > 50,000 < 250,000

    Read MoreRead Less