This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 08/13/2020 at 06:08:21 (UTC).

DESTIN, MARIA vs. ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 DESTIN, MARIA filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY INC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0205

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DESTIN, MARIA

Defendant

ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GELBER, MATTHEW R

Defendant Attorney

NUNN, JONATHAN BERNARD

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

7/7/2020: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED

6/30/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

6/18/2020: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

5/26/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

5/26/2020: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

5/20/2020: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

5/19/2020: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

5/15/2020: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION FOR LEAVE

5/13/2020: MOTION FOR LEAVE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

4/17/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ORDER TO EXTEND TIME

4/2/2020: ORDER TO EXTEND TIME

ORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

3/2/2020: ORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

2/25/2020: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

2/3/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

INTERROGATORIES ( V )

2/3/2020: INTERROGATORIES ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

2/3/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

2/3/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

2/3/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER - AGREED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketORDER ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BRONIS, BARBARA W; Location: Courtroom 3D - HC; Result: CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: GELBER, MATTHEW R ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020000011185 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 102636948 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200204235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/03/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA000205

    Read MoreRead Less