This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/29/2020 at 13:44:11 (UTC).

DERY, DEBRA vs. WINN DIXIE STORES INC

Case Summary

On 05/22/2019 DERY, DEBRA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WINN DIXIE STORES INC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1034

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DERY, DEBRA

Defendants

WINN DIXIE STORES INC

SHIPLEY, ALEXANDERA J

LYNCH, JEFFREY M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBERARD, PHILIP EDWIN IV

Defendant Attorney

HURLEY, CLAIRE RYANT

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO OVERRULE CONDITONS IN WAIVER OF OBJECTION ( V )

11/13/2019: MOTION TO OVERRULE CONDITONS IN WAIVER OF OBJECTION ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION ( V )

10/16/2019: CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

9/12/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

9/12/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

8/14/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

6/20/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

5/22/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

MOTION TO INSEPCT PREMISES ( V )

5/22/2019: MOTION TO INSEPCT PREMISES ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

5/22/2019: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

MOTION TO STRIKE

4/27/2020: MOTION TO STRIKE

COMPLAINT - AMENDED

4/23/2020: COMPLAINT - AMENDED

MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT

4/8/2020: MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT

MOTION TO AMEND BY INTERLINEATION ( V )

2/27/2020: MOTION TO AMEND BY INTERLINEATION ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED ( V )

2/24/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

2/3/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION ( V )

1/28/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION ( V )

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY NON-PARTY ( V )

1/24/2020: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY NON-PARTY ( V )

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO OVERRULE ( V )

1/9/2020: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO OVERRULE ( V )

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000031832; Applied Amount; $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: DEBERARD, PHILIP EDWIN IV - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA001034, DERY, DEBRA VS. WINN DIXIE STORES INC - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-4/15/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2020000031832 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 106262382 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200415235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL - OF MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketOTHER - PLAINTIFF'S INSURANCE INFORMATION DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 05/22/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA001034

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Winn Dixie Stores Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HURLEY, CLAIRE RYANT