This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/15/2023 at 22:54:37 (UTC).

DEROSA, DOUGLAS M vs. DEROSA, ANNA

Case Summary

On 11/15/2013 DEROSA, DOUGLAS M filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DEROSA, ANNA. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MULLINS, LEATHA DAWN, MCCANN, JAMES W, SCHWAB, CHARLES A and HEISEY, MICHAEL C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3194

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MULLINS, LEATHA DAWN

MCCANN, JAMES W

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

HEISEY, MICHAEL C

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DEROSA, DOUGLAS M

Respondent

DEROSA, ANNA

Not Yet Classified

DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

1 STEGER, LORI IRENE 2 STONE, ROBERT EUGENE

Respondent Attorney

1 HUNT, HILARY 2 CHANDLER, JOHN T

Not Yet Classified Attorney

CASTRO, HERNAN

 

Court Documents

EMERGENCY MOTION-PETITIONER'S VERIFIED EMERGENCY MOTION FOR SOLE PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITY, USE OF MARTIAL HOME, AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

3/28/2014: EMERGENCY MOTION-PETITIONER'S VERIFIED EMERGENCY MOTION FOR SOLE PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITY, USE OF MARTIAL HOME, AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

MOTION (NON DOR) FOR SOCIAL INVESTIGATION

10/23/2015: MOTION (NON DOR) FOR SOCIAL INVESTIGATION

EMERGENCY MOTION FOR SUPERVISED VISITATION (E-MAILED TO GK) ( V )

6/23/2017: EMERGENCY MOTION FOR SUPERVISED VISITATION (E-MAILED TO GK) ( V )

MOTION FOR REHEARING ( V )

6/29/2017: MOTION FOR REHEARING ( V )

MOTION FOR REHEARING ( V )

6/29/2017: MOTION FOR REHEARING ( V )

FINAL ORDER ON FORMER HUSBAND'S SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FOR MODIFICATION OF FINAL JUDGMENT (E-MAILED TO CS) ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4014.1229 / 4325346) ( V )

6/30/2017: FINAL ORDER ON FORMER HUSBAND'S SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FOR MODIFICATION OF FINAL JUDGMENT (E-MAILED TO CS) ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4014.1229 / 4325346) ( V )

ORDER ON MTN RE-HRG/RECONSIDERATION AND TO FIX SCRIVNER'S ERRORS ( V )

7/7/2017: ORDER ON MTN RE-HRG/RECONSIDERATION AND TO FIX SCRIVNER'S ERRORS ( V )

FORMER HUSBAND'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT ( V )

8/24/2017: FORMER HUSBAND'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT ( V )

MOTION FOR CONTEMPT ( V )

6/28/2018: MOTION FOR CONTEMPT ( V )

PETITION DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

11/15/2013: PETITION DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

COURT NOTES

8/24/2022: COURT NOTES

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE MULLINS, LEATHA DAWN: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL; Judge: HEISEY, MICHAEL C; Location: Courtroom 4B - HC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL; Judge: HEISEY, MICHAEL C; Location: Courtroom 4B - HC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL; Judge: HEISEY, MICHAEL C; Location: Courtroom 4B - HC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
456 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2013
  • DocketUCCJEA AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • DocketSEALED SS# DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: STONE, ROBERT EUGENE ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/15/2013 CASE NUMBER 2013DR003194

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • DocketPAYMENT $421.00 RECEIPT #2013000111519 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 7441340 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20131115235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant