This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 01/04/2021 at 16:31:19 (UTC).

DE LA CRUZ, ALEJANDRA LOPEZ vs. STARBOARD GROUP EMPLOYMENT SERVICES INC

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 DE LA CRUZ, ALEJANDRA LOPEZ filed an Other lawsuit against STARBOARD GROUP EMPLOYMENT SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1412

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DE LA CRUZ, ALEJANDRA LOPEZ

Defendant

STARBOARD GROUP EMPLOYMENT SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARMENTEROS, MIGUEL JR.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

9/23/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

9/22/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

COMPLAINT ( V )

9/21/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

9/21/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000066473; Applied Amount; $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: ARMENTEROS, MIGUEL JR. - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CA001412, DE LA CRUZ, ALEJANDRA LOPEZ VS. STARBOARD GROUP EMPLOYMENT SERVICES INC - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-9/23/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2020000066473 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 113784722 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200923235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000065781; Applied Amount; $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/21/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001412

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020000065781 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 113690530 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200921235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Armenteros, Miguel