This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/19/2021 at 03:21:28 (UTC).

CUNSOLO, SALVATORE vs. FAMILY SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 CUNSOLO, SALVATORE filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FAMILY SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY INC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRONIS, BARBARA W and BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1413

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRONIS, BARBARA W

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CUNSOLO, GAETANA

CUNSOLO, SALVATORE

Defendant

FAMILY SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KLOTZMAN, SCOTT ERIC

Defendant Attorneys

WEITZMAN, BRANDON J WEITZMAN

RIORDAN, JOHN SKYLER

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

2/4/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

MOTION FOR RELIEF ( V )

2/1/2021: MOTION FOR RELIEF ( V )

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

1/30/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ( V )

1/2/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ( V )

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

12/10/2020: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

MOTION TO DEEM DISCOVERY - AMENDED ( V )

12/1/2020: MOTION TO DEEM DISCOVERY - AMENDED ( V )

MOTION TO COMPEL ( V )

11/23/2020: MOTION TO COMPEL ( V )

ANSWER/DEFENSE/DEMAND FOR JURY ( V )

10/28/2020: ANSWER/DEFENSE/DEMAND FOR JURY ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY THE COURT ( V )

10/28/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY THE COURT ( V )

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSS ( V )

10/13/2020: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSS ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

10/13/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

10/1/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

9/21/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

9/21/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

9/21/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSS ( V )

9/21/2020: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSS ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/21/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

9/21/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR RELIEF ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2021
  • DocketANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BUCHANAN, LAURIE E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/21/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001413

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020000065777 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 113683135 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200921235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FAMILY SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIORDAN, JOHN SKYLER