Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 11/07/2020 at 13:10:31 (UTC).

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC vs. PAGAN, BERTHA M

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC filed an Other lawsuit against PAGAN, BERTHA M. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALONZO, EDMOND W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3408

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALONZO, EDMOND W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendant

PAGAN, BERTHA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WESEMAN, MELANIE S

MOEHLE, KRISTINA B

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/23/2020: ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

COMPLAINT ( V )

12/27/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

ANSWER ( V )

1/17/2020: ANSWER ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

1/4/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

12/30/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

12/27/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

12/27/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

SUMMARY JUDGMENT RECORDED - Recorded (Other.4497.1614 / 4771926)

10/26/2020: SUMMARY JUDGMENT RECORDED - Recorded (Other.4497.1614 / 4771926)

SUMMARY JUDGMENT RECORDED

10/23/2020: SUMMARY JUDGMENT RECORDED

COURT MINUTES

10/22/2020: COURT MINUTES

ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

10/8/2020: ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

8/27/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - AMENDED

8/26/2020: ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - AMENDED

COURT MINUTES

8/26/2020: COURT MINUTES

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

8/18/2020: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

COURT MINUTES

6/24/2020: COURT MINUTES

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/23/2020: ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

6/9/2020: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMARY JUDGMENT RECORDED - Recorded (Other.4497.1614 / 4771926)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMARY JUDGMENT RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingEvent: STATUS CONFERENCE; Judge: ALONZO, EDMOND W; Location: Courtroom K - SC; Result: DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Judge: ALONZO, EDMOND W; Location: Courtroom K - SC; Result: DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketMOTION HEARING SET FOR 10/22/2020 AT 2:00 PM IN K/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ALONZO, EDMOND W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • HearingEvent: STATUS CONFERENCE; Judge: ALONZO, EDMOND W; Location: Courtroom K - SC; Result: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: WESEMAN, MELANIE S ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: MOEHLE, KRISTINA B ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/30/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CC003408

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019000107949 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 100886815 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20191230235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketNOTICE CONF INFO ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crown Asset Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WESEMAN , MELANIE S

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moehle, Kristina B