Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 04/21/2021 at 03:20:16 (UTC).

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC VS AUGUSTIN, JOLYNE

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AUGUSTIN, JOLYNE. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ISENHOWER, DARYL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1367

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ISENHOWER, DARYL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendant

AUGUSTIN, JOLYNE

Port Saint Lucie, FL 34984

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PALMA, JORGE LUIS

MOEHLE, KRISTINA B

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

4/14/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

COMPLAINT

4/7/2021: COMPLAINT

NOTICE - STANDARD INSTRUCTIONS FOR ZOOM HEARING

4/7/2021: NOTICE - STANDARD INSTRUCTIONS FOR ZOOM HEARING

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/7/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED

4/7/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

4/7/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Judge: ISENHOWER, DARYL; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2021000028108; Applied Amount; $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: PALMA, JORGE LUIS - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021SC001367, PLAINTIFF NOT ENTERED VS. DEFENDANT NOT ENTERED - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 3 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-4/7/2021,NCICL-4/7/2021,NTC-4/7/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - STANDARD INSTRUCTIONS FOR ZOOM HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIALITY CLARIFICATION LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 05/24/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN VTR/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: PALMA, JORGE LUIS ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE CONF INFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 04/07/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021SC001367

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021000028108 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 124495799 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20210407235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crown Asset Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Palma, Jorge L, ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moehle, Kristina B