This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 06/23/2022 at 04:09:43 (UTC).

CROSDALE, TEHMEKA vs. WARD SR, PRESTON

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 CROSDALE, TEHMEKA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against WARD SR, PRESTON. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1292

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L

 

Party Details

Petitioners

CROSDALE, TEHMEKA

DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Respondent

WARD SR, PRESTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CASTRO, HERNAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: CASTRO, HERNAN - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022DR001292, CROSDALE, TEHMEKA VS. WARD SR, PRESTON - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-5/19/2022"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET (CS-ES15)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR PATERNITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketFAMILY COURT COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: CASTRO, HERNAN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 05/19/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022DR001292

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERNAN CASTRO