This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/10/2021 at 03:11:40 (UTC).

CRISTALES, RICHARD vs. FORT PIERCE GRILL & WINGS LLC

Case Summary

On 10/12/2020 CRISTALES, RICHARD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FORT PIERCE GRILL WINGS LLC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRONIS, BARBARA W and BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1536

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRONIS, BARBARA W

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRISTALES, RICHARD

Defendant

FORT PIERCE GRILL & WINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHOLTES, ANDREW RYAN

Defendant Attorney

BUNN, MARSHA

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO SET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ( V )

3/22/2021: ORDER TO SET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ( V )

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS ( V )

3/3/2021: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

2/26/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

ORDER COMPELLING ( V )

1/19/2021: ORDER COMPELLING ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR ( V )

1/15/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR ( V )

MOTION TO COMPEL ( V )

1/14/2021: MOTION TO COMPEL ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

12/16/2020: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS ( V )

11/24/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

11/2/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INTERROG'S ( V )

11/2/2020: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INTERROG'S ( V )

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

11/2/2020: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

11/2/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

10/21/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

10/12/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/12/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

10/12/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

10/12/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

10/12/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER COMPELLING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BUCHANAN, LAURIE E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: SHOLTES, ANDREW RYAN ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/12/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001536

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020000072135 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 114817754 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20201012235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHOLTES, ANDREW RYAN