This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/22/2023 at 16:03:14 (UTC).

CREATIVE CHOICE HOMES XX LTD vs. ALFARO, JESUS

Case Summary

On 08/29/2013 CREATIVE CHOICE HOMES XX LTD filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ALFARO, JESUS. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALSH, THOMAS J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1963

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALSH, THOMAS J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREATIVE CHOICE HOMES XX LTD

Defendant

ALFARO, JESUS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/29/2013: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

8/29/2013: COMPLAINT

EVICTION SUMMONS

8/29/2013: EVICTION SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED RMCCAIN@BARFIELDPA.COM

8/29/2013: SUMMONS ISSUED RMCCAIN@BARFIELDPA.COM

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

9/19/2013: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

9/19/2013: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY

9/19/2013: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

9/19/2013: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

DEFAULT

9/19/2013: DEFAULT

WRIT OF POSSESSION

9/27/2013: WRIT OF POSSESSION

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

10/2/2013: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERED

12/26/2013: MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERED

 

Docket Entries

09/19/2019

DocketAttorney RYAN RUFFNER MCCAIN - Deactivated by Automated Process

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/26/2013
View Court Documents

DocketMAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2013
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2013
View Court Documents

DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2013

DocketCASE CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2013

DocketJUDGMENT BY DEFAULT - Recorded (OR.3564.500 / 3881320)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2013
View Court Documents

DocketDEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2013
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2013
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2013
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2013
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2013

DocketPAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2013000085715

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2013
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED RMCCAIN@BARFIELDPA.COM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2013

DocketSUMMONS-CNTY CIVIL ASSESSED $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2013

DocketCOUNTY JUDGE WALSH, THOMAS J: ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2013
View Court Documents

DocketEVICTION SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2013
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2013
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2013

DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: MCCAIN, RYAN RUFFNER ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2013

DocketCASE FILED 08/29/2013 CASE NUMBER 2013CC001963

[+] Read More [-] Read Less