This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 07/28/2020 at 09:08:19 (UTC).

COOPER-ELLIS, ANN MARIE vs. AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 COOPER-ELLIS, ANN MARIE filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0148

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COOPER-ELLIS, ANN MARIE

Defendant

AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER, THOMAS A

Defendant Attorney

SCHARF, STEVEN L

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

5/15/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

3/17/2020: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

3/17/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

1/27/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION DATES ( V )

1/25/2020: NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION DATES ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

1/25/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

INTERROGATORIES ( V )

1/25/2020: INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

1/25/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

1/25/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

1/25/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

1/25/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

1/25/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2020
  • DocketAttorney THOMAS A SINGER - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2020
  • DocketAttorney STEVEN L SCHARF - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000008365; Applied Amount; $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: SINGER, THOMAS A - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CA000148, COOPER-ELLIS, ANN MARIE VS. AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-1/27/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020000008365 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 102225008 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200127235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: SINGER, THOMAS A ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION DATES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less