This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/25/2023 at 15:25:54 (UTC).

COLE LAW, CHRISTOPHER vs. LAW, KERRY

Case Summary

On 12/06/2022 COLE LAW, CHRISTOPHER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LAW, KERRY. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BAUER, SHERWOOD JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3017

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BAUER, SHERWOOD JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COLE LAW, CHRISTOPHER

Respondent

LAW, KERRY

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTING HEARING

12/30/2022: ORDER SETTING HEARING

FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO PROPERTY OR DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) (UNCONTESTED) - RECORDED (OTHER.4938.1421. / 5143156)

1/13/2023: FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO PROPERTY OR DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) (UNCONTESTED) - RECORDED (OTHER.4938.1421. / 5143156)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO PROPERTY OR DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) (UNCONTESTED) - RECORDED (OTHER.4938.1421. / 5143156)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BAUER, SHERWOOD JR; Location: Courtroom 4B - HC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO PROPERTY OR DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) (UNCONTESTED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BAUER, SHERWOOD JR: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 01/10/2023 AT 10:00 AM IN 4B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BAUER, SHERWOOD JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketANSWER AND WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketMILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketSEALED SS# DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketFAMILY COURT COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/06/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022DR003017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less