Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 03/31/2021 at 04:20:01 (UTC).

CITIBANK NA AS TRUSTEE FOR CMLTI ASSET TRUST vs. SIMPSON, VINNETT

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 CITIBANK NA AS TRUSTEE FOR CMLTI ASSET TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SIMPSON, VINNETT. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1477

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK NA AS TRUSTEE FOR CMLTI ASSET TRUST

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

SIMPSON, VINNETT

WASTE PRO USA INC

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VINNETT SIMPSON

BANK OF AMERICA NA

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

FAY SERVICING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

PIERRE, FAUDLIN

KISER, AMY MARIE

ZAKARIAN, ALBERT APGAR

ROBINSON, DWAYNE A

POLETTI, JULIA Y

 

Court Documents

LIS PENDENS ( V )

10/1/2020: LIS PENDENS ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

10/1/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING - AMENDED ( V )

3/26/2021: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING - AMENDED ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

2/8/2021: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

COURT NOTES

2/8/2021: COURT NOTES

MOTION TO COMPEL ( V )- SUPPLEMENT

2/1/2021: MOTION TO COMPEL ( V )- SUPPLEMENT

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

1/28/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ( V )

1/21/2021: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

1/21/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

1/20/2021: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

12/31/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

11/30/2020: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ( V )

10/29/2020: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

10/21/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/1/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/1/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/1/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

10/1/2020: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: METZGER, ELIZABETH A; Location: Courtroom 3E - HC; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING - AMENDED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: ZAKARIAN, ALBERT APGAR ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFAULT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATED SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 04/05/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN 3E/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: METZGER, ELIZABETH A

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/01/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001477

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WASTE PRO USA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Fay Servicing, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant