This case was last updated from St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/23/2022 at 13:05:05 (UTC).

CICIOLA, MARY vs. MICHAEL ELLIOTT DMD

Case Summary

On 03/24/2022 CICIOLA, MARY filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against MICHAEL ELLIOTT DMD. This case was filed in St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0541

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CICIOLA, MARY

Defendants

MICHAEL ELLIOTT DMD

WELL BEING ENDO PA

ORAL FACIAL SURGICAL ASSOCIATES DENTAL IMPLANT CEN

STRAUSS & STRAUSS DMDS PA

ORAL FACIAL SURGICAL ASSOCIATES AND DESIGN OF THRE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVINE, LISA SUE

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS EXTENSION IN MEDICAL MALPRACTICE ACTION

3/24/2022: PETITION FOR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS EXTENSION IN MEDICAL MALPRACTICE ACTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketAttorney LISA SUE LEVINE - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS EXTENSION IN MEDICAL MALPRACTICE ACTION -AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $42.00 RECEIPT #2022000024509 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 146365242 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20220328235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: LEVINE, LISA SUE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS EXTENSION IN MEDICAL MALPRACTICE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/24/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022CA000541

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVINE, LISA SUE