This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/21/2021 at 04:33:28 (UTC).

CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY vs. TRADITION VILLAGE CENTER LLC

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against TRADITION VILLAGE CENTER LLC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1551

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

TRADITION VILLAGE CENTER LLC

THE LANDING AT TRADITION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY LLC

LANDING PHASE II LLC

TRADITION DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC

INLAND DIVERSIFIED PORT ST. LUCIE SQUARE LLC

INLAND DIVERSIFIED PORT ST. LUCIE LANDING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLANT, JEFFREY NEIL

Defendant Attorneys

FEE, FRANK HENRY IV

MCKENNA, CHRISTINE JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

10/14/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

10/12/2021: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

10/12/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

9/20/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

9/16/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

9/16/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

9/3/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/2/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/2/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/2/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/2/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/2/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/2/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

9/2/2021: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

9/2/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2021
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2021000069556; Applied Amount; $462.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: GOLANT, JEFFREY NEIL - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CA001551, CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY VS. TRADITION VILLAGE CENTER LLC - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-9/3/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $462.50 RECEIPT #2021000069556 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 133929444 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20210903235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE METZGER, ELIZABETH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/02/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CA001551

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christine Mckenna

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEE, FRANK HENRY III