This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 03/02/2021 at 14:04:27 (UTC).

CHAMPION, REAGAN vs. AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 CHAMPION, REAGAN filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AVATAR PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRONIS, BARBARA W and BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1409

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRONIS, BARBARA W

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHAMPION, WILLIAM E

CHAMPION, REAGAN

Defendant

AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELLI, MICHAEL C

Defendant Attorney

ROBERTS, SHIELA R

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM ( V )

1/19/2021: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM ( V )

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ( V )

1/19/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ( V )

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT ( V )

11/10/2020: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT ( V )

ANSWER/DEFENSE/DEMAND FOR JURY ( V )

10/20/2020: ANSWER/DEFENSE/DEMAND FOR JURY ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

10/16/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

9/26/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

9/21/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

9/18/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

9/18/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

9/18/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/18/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

9/18/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

9/18/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketAttorney SHIELA R ROBERTS - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketAttorney MICHAEL C MELLI - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketAttorney MICHAEL C MELLI - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BUCHANAN, LAURIE E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER/DEFENSE/DEMAND FOR JURY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ATTORNEY: ROBERTS, SHIELA R ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020000065759 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 113629128 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200921235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: MELLI, MICHAEL C ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/18/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001409

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Avatar Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant