This case was last updated from St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/19/2022 at 14:38:44 (UTC).

CEMEX CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS FLORIDA LLC vs. PROCTOR, JAMES A

Case Summary

On 12/09/2021 CEMEX CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS FLORIDA LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PROCTOR, JAMES A. This case was filed in St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2041

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CEMEX CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS FLORIDA LLC

Defendants

PROCTOR, JAMES A

PROCTOR, BETH A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PINEIRO, ANDREW ARTHUR

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

12/9/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

12/9/2021: COMPLAINT ( V )

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

12/9/2021: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

12/9/2021: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

CASE PLAN ( V )

12/9/2021: CASE PLAN ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

12/9/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

12/9/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

12/9/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

12/20/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

12/20/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

ANSWER ( V )

12/21/2021: ANSWER ( V )

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V ) - RECORDED (OR.4748.82 / 4973476) ( V )

1/2/2022: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V ) - RECORDED (OR.4748.82 / 4973476) ( V )

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL & DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS

1/25/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL & DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OTHER4762.782 / 4985094)

1/27/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OTHER4762.782 / 4985094)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketAttorney ANDREW ARTHUR PINEIRO - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OTHER4762.782 / 4985094)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL & DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2022000006572 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 142565696 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20220125235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V ) - RECORDED (OR.4748.82 / 4973476) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE PLAN ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: PINEIRO, ANDREW ARTHUR ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE METZGER, ELIZABETH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/09/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CA002041

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $429.00 RECEIPT #2021000094532 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 140020445 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20211209235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEMEX CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS FLORIDA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PINEIRO, ANDREW ARTHUR