This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 10/11/2020 at 22:05:43 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs. WITHROW, AUDREY

Case Summary

On 10/23/2017 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WITHROW, AUDREY. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ISENHOWER, DARYL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1945

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ISENHOWER, DARYL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

WITHROW, AUDREY

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/23/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

10/23/2017: COMPLAINT ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

10/23/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

11/6/2017: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

COURT MINUTES ( V )

12/11/2017: COURT MINUTES ( V )

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS ( V )

2/27/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS ( V )

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS/AMOUNT DUE ( V )

2/27/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS/AMOUNT DUE ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT ( V )

2/27/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT ( V )

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

2/27/2018: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) ( V )

3/6/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4105.440 / 4408949) ( V )

3/7/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4105.440 / 4408949) ( V )

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME ( V )

9/21/2019: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketAttorney BRYAN MANNO - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney ASHLEY LENEE MOORE - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4105.440 / 4408949) ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS/AMOUNT DUE ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2017
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: MOORE, ASHLEY LENEE - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2017SC001945, CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS. WITHROW, AUDREY - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-10/23/2017"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/11/2017 AT 1:30 PM IN L/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketNOTICE CONF INFO ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: MOORE, ASHLEY LENEE ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/23/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017SC001945

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017000078002 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 63176951 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20171023235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant