Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 11/08/2020 at 14:43:26 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC vs. KATOLIK, LARISA

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed an Other lawsuit against KATOLIK, LARISA. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALONZO, EDMOND W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3410

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALONZO, EDMOND W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CITIBANK NA

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

KATOLIK, LARISA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOEHLE, KRISTINA B

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/23/2020: ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

1/4/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

12/27/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

12/30/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

12/27/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

12/27/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) - Recorded (Other.4448.2779 / 4731766)

7/21/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) - Recorded (Other.4448.2779 / 4731766)

FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM)

7/20/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM)

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

7/17/2020: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

7/17/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

7/17/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT TRIAL

7/7/2020: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT TRIAL

ORDER SETTING HEARING

6/24/2020: ORDER SETTING HEARING

COURT MINUTES

6/24/2020: COURT MINUTES

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

6/9/2020: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

DEFAULT

5/19/2020: DEFAULT

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

5/19/2020: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

5/19/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketAttorney KRISTINA B MOEHLE - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketAttorney KRISTINA B MOEHLE - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL; Judge: ALONZO, EDMOND W; Location: Courtroom K - SC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) - Recorded (Other.4448.2779 / 4731766)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIALITY CLARIFICATION LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: MOEHLE, KRISTINA B ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/30/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CC003410

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019000107956 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 100887623 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20191230235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketNOTICE CONF INFO ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moehle, Kristina B