This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 08/29/2022 at 05:06:54 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. vs. CERISIER, GUIRLENE

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CERISIER, GUIRLENE. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ISENHOWER, DARYL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2180

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ISENHOWER, DARYL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

CERISIER, GUIRLENE

Port Saint Lucie, FL 34983-2539

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY, JASON SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

CASTELLANOS, J NICHOLAS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

6/30/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

6/30/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

6/30/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/5/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE- ZOOM INSTRUCTIONS

7/5/2022: NOTICE- ZOOM INSTRUCTIONS

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

7/12/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

7/27/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

COURT MINUTES

8/8/2022: COURT MINUTES

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

8/19/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - RECORDED (OTHER.4876.1256. / 5086478)

8/19/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - RECORDED (OTHER.4876.1256. / 5086478)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - RECORDED (OTHER.4876.1256. / 5086478)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Judge: ISENHOWER, DARYL; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote; Result: DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT ATTORNEY: CASTELLANOS, J NICHOLAS ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: DRAGUTSKY, JASON SCOTT - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022SC002180, CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. VS. CERISIER, GUIRLENE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-7/5/2022,NTC-7/5/2022"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- ZOOM INSTRUCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 08/08/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN VTR/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: DRAGUTSKY, JASON SCOTT ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022000051546 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 152511781 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20220705235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/30/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022SC002180

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASTELLANOS , J NICHOLAS