This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 10/05/2020 at 17:46:34 (UTC).

CASTLE PINES CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. vs. VALDES-FUSTER, MAYDA

Case Summary

On 04/04/2017 CASTLE PINES CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against VALDES-FUSTER, MAYDA. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALONZO, EDMOND W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0773

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALONZO, EDMOND W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTLE PINES CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.

Defendants

OCCUPANT, UNKNOWN

VALDES-FUSTER, MAYDA

FUSTER, CARLOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLATER, JASON DAVID

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT ( V )

4/4/2017: COMPLAINT ( V )

LIS PENDENS ( V )

4/4/2017: LIS PENDENS ( V )

NOTICE - VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY ( V )

4/4/2017: NOTICE - VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

4/4/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

4/4/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

4/4/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

4/4/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

4/4/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

4/4/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

LIS PENDENS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.3981.144 / 4294385) ( V )

4/5/2017: LIS PENDENS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.3981.144 / 4294385) ( V )

RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

6/28/2017: RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ( V )

6/28/2017: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ( V )

RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4013.2579 / 4324820) ( V )

6/28/2017: RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4013.2579 / 4324820) ( V )

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4013.2580 / 4324821) ( V )

6/28/2017: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4013.2580 / 4324821) ( V )

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney JASON DAVID SLATER - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2017000049676; Applied Amount; $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4013.2580 / 4324821) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRELEASE OF LIS PENDENS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4013.2579 / 4324820) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRELEASE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2017000049676 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 58358781 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20170628235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2017000026794; Applied Amount; $335.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.3981.144 / 4294385) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: SLATER, JASON DAVID ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND WARREN III: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 04/04/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CC000773

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT $335.00 RECEIPT #2017000026794 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 54627817 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20170404235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CASTLE PINES CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant