This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 08/29/2023 at 13:03:35 (UTC).

FIRST COMMUNITY INSURANCE COMPANY ASO RUMSEY vs. ADAMS HOMES OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA INC

Case Summary

On 05/10/2023 FIRST COMMUNITY INSURANCE COMPANY ASO RUMSEY filed an Other lawsuit against ADAMS HOMES OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA INC. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALONZO, EDMOND W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1338

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALONZO, EDMOND W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST COMMUNITY INSURANCE COMPANY ASO RUMSEY

Defendant

ADAMS HOMES OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARKER, STEPHEN LAWRENCE

Defendant Attorney

DEGEL, BRANDON SCOTT

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/10/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

5/10/2023: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

5/10/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING

5/10/2023: ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING

ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING

5/10/2023: ATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING

SUMMONS ISSUED

5/10/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

6/1/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

6/12/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO COMPEL

6/12/2023: MOTION TO COMPEL

NOTICE OF HEARING

7/12/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2023
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Judge: ALONZO, EDMOND W; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketMOTION HEARING SET FOR 08/31/2023 AT 2:30 PM IN VTR/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ALONZO, EDMOND W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: BARKER, STEPHEN LAWRENCE - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2023CC001338, FIRST COMMUNITY INSURANCE COMPANY ASO RUMSEY VS. ADAMS HOMES OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA INC - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-5/10/2023"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: BARKER, STEPHEN LAWRENCE ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND W: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketCASE FILED 05/10/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023CC001338

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023000040009 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 172820246 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20230510235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less