This case was last updated from St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/14/2023 at 12:14:56 (UTC).

FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION vs. UNKNOWN HEIRS

Case Summary

On 05/16/2023 FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against UNKNOWN HEIRS. This case was filed in St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1756

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Defendants

UNKNOWN HEIRS

BLUE, WILLIAM L

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM L BLUE

BLUE, DARIAN

BLUE, MARIAH

BLUE, MARTRAVIOUS J

BLUE, GENEKA DICHELLE

BLUE, DALLAS

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBINS, STACY DALE

Defendant Attorney

CRUZ, AYANA

 

Court Documents

CORRESPONDENCE

8/9/2023: CORRESPONDENCE

ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND

8/9/2023: ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

7/26/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

7/26/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

7/26/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

7/26/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

AFFIDAVIT CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

7/26/2023: AFFIDAVIT CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED

7/26/2023: NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED

6/30/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

5/16/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

5/16/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

5/16/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

5/16/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

5/16/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

5/16/2023: VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

LIS PENDENS

5/16/2023: LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT

5/16/2023: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/16/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketCASE FILED 05/16/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023CA001756

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less