This case was last updated from St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/18/2023 at 15:02:35 (UTC).

MOQUIN, ALYSSA vs. THE BOYS & GIRLS CLUBS OF ST. LUCIE COUNTY, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/21/2023 MOQUIN, ALYSSA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE BOYS GIRLS CLUBS OF ST LUCIE COUNTY, INC. This case was filed in St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WARONICKI, BRETT M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0945

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WARONICKI, BRETT M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOQUIN, ALYSSA

Defendant

THE BOYS & GIRLS CLUBS OF ST. LUCIE COUNTY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHOLTES, ANDREW RYAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/21/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

3/21/2023: COMPLAINT

OATH OF GUARDIAN

8/10/2023: OATH OF GUARDIAN

PETITION TO WAIVE CREDIT/CRIMINAL & EDUCATIONAL REQUIREMENTS

8/10/2023: PETITION TO WAIVE CREDIT/CRIMINAL & EDUCATIONAL REQUIREMENTS

MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN/ADMINISTRATOR/ OR ATTORNEY AD LITEM

8/10/2023: MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN/ADMINISTRATOR/ OR ATTORNEY AD LITEM

ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT & DISBURSAL OF FUNDS

8/11/2023: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT & DISBURSAL OF FUNDS

ORDER WAIVING INVESTIGATION AND EDUCATIONAL REQUIREMENTS

8/11/2023: ORDER WAIVING INVESTIGATION AND EDUCATIONAL REQUIREMENTS

ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN

8/11/2023: ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN

ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT & DISBURSAL OF FUNDS - RECORDED (OTHER.5031.1945. / 5231052)

8/17/2023: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT & DISBURSAL OF FUNDS - RECORDED (OTHER.5031.1945. / 5231052)

 

Docket Entries

08/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT & DISBURSAL OF FUNDS - RECORDED (OTHER.5031.1945. / 5231052)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketCASE CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER WAIVING INVESTIGATION AND EDUCATIONAL REQUIREMENTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT & DISBURSAL OF FUNDS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

Docket"RECIPIENTS: SHOLTES, ANDREW RYAN - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2023CA000945, MOQUIN, ALYSSA VS. THE BOYS & GIRLS CLUBS OF ST. LUCIE COUNTY, INC. - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NCICL-8/10/2023"

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIALITY CLARIFICATION LETTER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketPETITION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR'S SETTLEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN/ADMINISTRATOR/ OR ATTORNEY AD LITEM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION TO WAIVE CREDIT/CRIMINAL & EDUCATIONAL REQUIREMENTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketOATH OF GUARDIAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIALITY LIST OF 23

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023

DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023000024294 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 169256860 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20230322235959.TXT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE WARONICKI, BRETT M: ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: SHOLTES, ANDREW RYAN ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

DocketCASE FILED 03/21/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023CA000945

[+] Read More [-] Read Less