This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/11/2021 at 06:20:43 (UTC).

CASE, RACHEL vs. WINN DIXIE STORES INC

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 CASE, RACHEL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WINN DIXIE STORES INC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRONIS, BARBARA W and BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1547

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRONIS, BARBARA W

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASE, RACHEL

Defendants

PRESTEN, GLENN

HURST, MICHAEL

WINN DIXIE STORES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOYD, JAMES CURTIS

Defendant Attorney

SHIELDS, CAITLIN M

 

Court Documents

PRIVILEGE LOG ( V )

3/4/2021: PRIVILEGE LOG ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

3/4/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ( V )

3/4/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ( V )

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

2/11/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

2/10/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

1/25/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ( V )

1/12/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR ( V )

1/5/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR ( V )

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS- AMENDED ( V )

11/24/2020: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS- AMENDED ( V )

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS 1-8 ( V )

11/18/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS 1-8 ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

11/12/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

11/12/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

11/12/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

11/12/2020: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

11/12/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

10/14/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/13/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

10/13/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVILEGE LOG ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - AMENDED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BUCHANAN, LAURIE E; Location: Courtroom 3D - HC; Result: CASE HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 02/11/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN 3D/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: BOYD, JAMES CURTIS ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2020000072904 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 114892660 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20201014235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/13/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001547

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Winn Dixie Stores Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHIELDS , CAITLIN M