This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/13/2023 at 14:22:45 (UTC).

CARROLL COLLINS BONDING vs. THITCHENER, PAMELA

Case Summary

On 04/06/2006 CARROLL COLLINS BONDING filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THITCHENER, PAMELA. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARNES, CLIFF. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0805

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARNES, CLIFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARROLL COLLINS BONDING

Defendants

RALPH, JOHN

WEBB, NIKKI JEAN HAWLEY

THITCHERNER, CONRAD

THITCHENER, PAMELA

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT < $2500

4/6/2006: COMPLAINT < $2500

SUMMONS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE:PAMELA M THITCHENER(RET CONRAD A THITCHENER(RET01-MAY-2006 UNEXECUTED) RALPH JOHN OLES(RET 20-APR-2006 SER UNCLAIMED NIKKI JEAN HAWLEY WEBB(RET 11-APR-2006 SER 10-APR-2005

4/6/2006: SUMMONS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE:PAMELA M THITCHENER(RET CONRAD A THITCHENER(RET01-MAY-2006 UNEXECUTED) RALPH JOHN OLES(RET 20-APR-2006 SER UNCLAIMED NIKKI JEAN HAWLEY WEBB(RET 11-APR-2006 SER 10-APR-2005

RETURN OF SERVICE

4/11/2006: RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE

4/20/2006: RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE

5/1/2006: RETURN OF SERVICE

STIPULATION ORDER (2DJUD)

5/22/2006: STIPULATION ORDER (2DJUD)

AFFIDAVIT NON-PAYMENT (2ROPN):ON NIKKI JEAN HAWLEY WEBB

10/18/2007: AFFIDAVIT NON-PAYMENT (2ROPN):ON NIKKI JEAN HAWLEY WEBB

JUDGMENT ON STIPULATION (2DAPC

10/24/2007: JUDGMENT ON STIPULATION (2DAPC

 

Docket Entries

10/24/2007

DocketDISPOSED AFT PREVIOUSLY CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2007
View Court Documents

DocketJUDGMENT ON STIPULATION (2DAPC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2007

DocketREOPEN CASE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2007
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT NON-PAYMENT (2ROPN):ON NIKKI JEAN HAWLEY WEBB

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2006

HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Judge: BARNES, CLIFF; Location: Courtroom K - SC; Result: 2OST

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2006

DocketDISPOSED BY JUDGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2006
View Court Documents

DocketSTIPULATION ORDER (2DJUD)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2006

DocketSTIPULATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2006
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2006
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2006
View Court Documents

DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2006

DocketSTYLE OF CASE:CARROLL COLLINS VS PAMELA M THICHENER,CONRAD A THITCHENER,RALPH JOHN OLES AND NIKKE JEAN HAWLEY WEBB

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2006
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE:PAMELA M THITCHENER(RET CONRAD A THITCHENER(RET01-MAY-2006 UNEXECUTED) RALPH JOHN OLES(RET 20-APR-2006 SER UNCLAIMED NIKKI JEAN HAWLEY WEBB(RET 11-APR-2006 SER 10-APR-2005

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2006

DocketASSIGNED TO JUDGE BARNES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2006
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT < $2500

[+] Read More [-] Read Less