This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 10/09/2020 at 00:48:50 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA vs. ZOCCOLILLO, PATRICIA M

Case Summary

On 08/15/2017 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ZOCCOLILLO, PATRICIA M. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ISENHOWER, DARYL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1527

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ISENHOWER, DARYL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

Defendant

ZOCCOLILLO, PATRICIA M

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT ( V )

8/15/2017: COMPLAINT ( V )

NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

8/15/2017: NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

8/15/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

8/15/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

9/15/2017: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

COURT MINUTES ( V )

9/25/2017: COURT MINUTES ( V )

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS ( V )

12/13/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS ( V )

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

12/13/2017: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS ( V )

12/13/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) ( V )

12/21/2017: FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4084.2576 / 4388466) ( V )

1/9/2018: FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4084.2576 / 4388466) ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney JOSEPH F ROSEN - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4084.2576 / 4388466) ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Judge: ISENHOWER, DARYL; Location: Courtroom L - SC; Result: DISPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2017
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2017SC001527, CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA VS. ZOCCOLILLO, PATRICIA M - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-8/15/2017"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 09/25/2017 AT 1:30 PM IN L/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: ROSEN, JOSEPH F ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/15/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017SC001527

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017000061897 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 60402819 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20170815235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant