This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 11/02/2020 at 11:01:41 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA vs. BRINLEY, JOANN

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA filed an Other lawsuit against BRINLEY, JOANN. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALONZO, EDMOND W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2432

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALONZO, EDMOND W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA

Defendant

BRINLEY, JOANN

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

3/5/2020: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/13/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

9/13/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

3/5/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

2/17/2020: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

DEFAULT ( V )

2/17/2020: DEFAULT ( V )

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

9/13/2019: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

3/5/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

9/13/2019: NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketCOPY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketAttorney DANIELA S MUIR - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • HearingEvent: STATUS CONFERENCE; Judge: ALONZO, EDMOND W; Location: Courtroom K - SC; Result: CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM) - Recorded (Other.4397.2029 / 4689041)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT (GENERAL FORM)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: MUIR, DANIELA S ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND W: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019000076547 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 95696647 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20190916235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketNOTICE CONF INFO ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/13/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CC002432

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant