This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/28/2021 at 13:02:08 (UTC).

CANALES, REBECA RADA vs. CAMPOS, GERLIN F ROSA

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 CANALES, REBECA RADA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CAMPOS, GERLIN F ROSA. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRONIS, BARBARA W and BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1411

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRONIS, BARBARA W

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MAURO, CARLOS D

CANALES, REBECA RADA

Defendants

PORTILLO, NOLVIA ADELSO

CAMPOS, GERLIN F ROSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUSCHOTT, LEE EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

GARCIA, FRANCISCO JAVIER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BUCHANAN, LAURIE E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ATTORNEY: GARCIA, FRANCISCO JAVIER ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000065734; Applied Amount; $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: MUSCHOTT, LEE EDWARD - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CA001411, CANALES, REBECA RADA VS. CAMPOS, GERLIN ROSA - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-9/21/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: MUSCHOTT, LEE EDWARD ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2020000065734 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 113506855 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200921235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/17/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001411

    Read MoreRead Less