This case was last updated from St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/24/2022 at 05:47:37 (UTC).

CALIGUIRE, GREGORY vs. THOMAS, JADE DR

Case Summary

On 08/06/2021 CALIGUIRE, GREGORY filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against THOMAS, JADE DR. This case was filed in St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1417

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIGUIRE, GREGORY

Defendants

THOMAS, JADE DR

BANYAN DENTAL SERVICES PSL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NORDT, GREGORY MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

MORGAN, KENNETH WILLIAM JR.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT ( V )

8/6/2021: COMPLAINT ( V )

MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

10/5/2021: MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT ATTORNEY: MORGAN, KENNETH WILLIAM JR. ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CA001417, CALIGUIRE, GREGORY VS. THOMAS, JADE DR - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOA-10/5/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: NORDT, GREGORY MICHAEL - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CA001417, CALIGUIRE, GREGORY VS. THOMAS, JADE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-8/9/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BUCHANAN, LAURIE E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: NORDT, GREGORY MICHAEL ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2021000062340 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 132233966 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20210809235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/06/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CA001417

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Morgan Jr, Kenneth W, ESQ.