This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/22/2020 at 04:28:07 (UTC).

BUSICK, MICHAEL vs. SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 BUSICK, MICHAEL filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1433

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BUSICK, MICHAEL

BUSICK, REGINA

Defendant

SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALEXANDER, BRITTANY

Defendant Attorney

ABRAHAM, MANAL

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

10/5/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

10/1/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

9/24/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED

9/24/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

9/24/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

9/24/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

9/24/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSS

9/24/2020: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/24/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000066755; Applied Amount; $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: ALEXANDER, BRITTANY - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CA001433, BUSICK, MICHAEL VS. SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-9/24/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: ALEXANDER, BRITTANY ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/24/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001433

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020000066755 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 113884597 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200924235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less