This case was last updated from St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/01/2022 at 06:07:14 (UTC).

BURNS, CHRISTOPHER vs. RODRIGUEZ, DANIEL

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 BURNS, CHRISTOPHER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ, DANIEL. This case was filed in St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1334

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BURNS, CHRISTOPHER

Defendants

RODRIGUEZ, DANIEL

REYNOSO, CRISTAL

SOUTHERN OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BENNETT, ANTHONY

BENNETT, TONY

Defendant Attorneys

FORTUNATO, RAPHAEL

PETERFRIEND, WILLIAM J

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

9/21/2022: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

9/20/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

9/16/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR COPIES

9/12/2022: REQUEST FOR COPIES

CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION

9/9/2022: CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION

NOTICE OF TRIAL

9/8/2022: NOTICE OF TRIAL

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

8/31/2022: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

8/29/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

8/29/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES

8/29/2022: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES

8/29/2022: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - DANIEL & CRISTAL

8/26/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - DANIEL & CRISTAL

REQUEST TO PRODUCE - DANIEL & CRISTAL

8/26/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE - DANIEL & CRISTAL

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS - DANIEL & CRISTAL

8/26/2022: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS - DANIEL & CRISTAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DANIEL & CRISTAL

8/26/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DANIEL & CRISTAL

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - SOUTHERN

8/24/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - SOUTHERN

REQUEST TO PRODUCE - SOUTHERN

8/24/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE - SOUTHERN

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - SOUTHERN

8/24/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - SOUTHERN

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BUCHANAN, LAURIE E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: BENNETT, ANTHONY ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 07/26/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022CA001334

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2022000057746 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 154034617 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20220726235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Southern-Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fortunato, Raphael

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peterfriend, William J