This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 06/28/2022 at 05:12:53 (UTC).

BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC vs. SMITH, VINNIE MAE

Case Summary

On 04/12/2022 BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SMITH, VINNIE MAE. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALONZO, EDMOND W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1176

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALONZO, EDMOND W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC

Defendant

SMITH, VINNIE MAE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

1 HERNANDEZ, ILIANA M 2 MOEHLE, KRISTINA B

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/12/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

4/12/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

4/12/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS ISSUED

4/12/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

4/20/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

COURT MINUTES

5/25/2022: COURT MINUTES

ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT

5/25/2022: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT

ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT - RECORDED (OTHER.4831.1113. / 5045600)

5/26/2022: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT - RECORDED (OTHER.4831.1113. / 5045600)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketAttorney ILIANA M HERNANDEZ - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT - RECORDED (OTHER.4831.1113. / 5045600)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Judge: ALONZO, EDMOND W; Location: Courtroom K - SC; Result: DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: HERNANDEZ, ILIANA M - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022SC001176, BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC VS. SMITH, VINNIE MAE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-4/12/2022"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 05/25/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN K/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ALONZO, EDMOND W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: HERNANDEZ, ILIANA M ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: MOEHLE, KRISTINA B ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 04/12/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022SC001176

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2022000028935 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 147536130 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20220412235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC is a litigant