This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 10/16/2021 at 11:25:07 (UTC).

BRIDGES, LUKSIKA vs. BRIDGES, BRUCE

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 BRIDGES, LUKSIKA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BRIDGES, BRUCE. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEISEY, MICHAEL C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2456

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEISEY, MICHAEL C

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRIDGES, LUKSIKA

Respondents

BRIDGES, BRUCE FRANCES

BRIDGES, BRUCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DADAN, SASHA GYSEMIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY BUT NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) - Recorded (Other.4701.1548 / 4936522) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: HEISEY, MICHAEL C; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY BUT NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN)- DUPLICATE FILING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY BUT NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 10/11/2021 AT 8:45 AM IN VTR/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: HEISEY, MICHAEL C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND WAIVER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: DADAN, SASHA GYSEMIA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/17/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021DR002456

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $418.00 RECEIPT #2021000073099 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 134747862 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20210917235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketSEALED SS# DISCLOSURE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COURT COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DADAN, SASHA GYSEMIA