This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/20/2020 at 22:21:16 (UTC).

BOHORQUEZ, CESAR vs. CAPITOL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Case Summary

On 10/01/2019 BOHORQUEZ, CESAR filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CAPITOL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY INC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1879

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOHORQUEZ, CESAR

Defendant

CAPITOL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUBOFF, KENNETH ROBERT

Defendant Attorney

FERNANDEZ, PATRICIA ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

12/2/2019: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS ( V )

11/19/2019: RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS ( V )

ORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

10/31/2019: ORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

10/30/2019: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

10/10/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

10/2/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

9/30/2019: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

9/30/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

9/30/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

COMPLAINT- PETITION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF ( V )

9/30/2019: COMPLAINT- PETITION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF ( V )

NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

9/30/2019: NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/30/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

9/30/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000081227; Applied Amount; $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: DUBOFF, KENNETH ROBERT - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA001879, BOHORQUEZ, CESAR VS. CAPITOL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY INC - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-10/2/2019"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: DUBOFF, KENNETH ROBERT ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019000081227 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 96463237 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20191002235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/01/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA001879

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT- PETITION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less