This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 03/19/2021 at 16:29:34 (UTC).

BLANCO, LUIS E vs. ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 BLANCO, LUIS E filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRONIS, BARBARA W and BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1404

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRONIS, BARBARA W

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BLANCO, GLORIA A

BLANCO, LUIS E

Defendant

ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROSENBAUM, DANIEL

LEVY, HAROLD

Defendant Attorney

MALIN, GLENN HOWARD

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION ( V )

3/17/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION ( V )

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ( V )

3/11/2021: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ( V )

ORDER COMPELLING DEPOSITION OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE ( V )

3/10/2021: ORDER COMPELLING DEPOSITION OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE ( V )

MOTION TO COMPEL ( V )

3/8/2021: MOTION TO COMPEL ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING - ZOOM ( V )

2/19/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING - ZOOM ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

1/22/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

1/22/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

PRIVILEGE LOG ( V )

12/21/2020: PRIVILEGE LOG ( V )

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

12/21/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

11/15/2020: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

REPLY ( V )

10/28/2020: REPLY ( V )

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

10/26/2020: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

ORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

10/22/2020: ORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

9/21/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

9/18/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/18/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

9/18/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

9/18/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO DEPO OF CORP REP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER COMPELLING DEPOSITION OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BUCHANAN, LAURIE E; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote; Result: CASE HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 03/08/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN VTR/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - ZOOM ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: LEVY, HAROLD ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020000065743 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 113609403 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200921235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING REQUESTE FOR DEPOSITIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/18/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001404

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENBAUM, DANIEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Levy, Harold, ESQ.