This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 01/17/2021 at 12:22:41 (UTC).

BLAIR, DELFON vs. KEN J MASCARA AS SHERIFF

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 BLAIR, DELFON filed an Other lawsuit against KEN J MASCARA AS SHERIFF. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1398

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLAIR, DELFON

Defendant

KEN J MASCARA AS SHERIFF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

JOSS, HARRISON ADAN

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (Other.4503.1998 / 4776840) ( V )

11/5/2020: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (Other.4503.1998 / 4776840) ( V )

ORDER OF DISMISSAL ( V )

11/4/2020: ORDER OF DISMISSAL ( V )

COURT NOTES

11/4/2020: COURT NOTES

MOTION TO OBJECTION ( V )

10/29/2020: MOTION TO OBJECTION ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT ( V )

10/23/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

10/22/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

10/19/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

NOTICE OF PLTF'S STATUS ( V )

10/19/2020: NOTICE OF PLTF'S STATUS ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

10/19/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

10/13/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

10/7/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

PETITION FOR EXTRAORDINARY WRIT (HABEAS CORPUS,PROHIBITION, MANDAMUS, QUO WARRANTO) ( V )

10/7/2020: PETITION FOR EXTRAORDINARY WRIT (HABEAS CORPUS,PROHIBITION, MANDAMUS, QUO WARRANTO) ( V )

APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

10/7/2020: APPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/18/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

REQUEST ( V )

9/18/2020: REQUEST ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

9/18/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

9/18/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketAttorney HARRISON ADAN JOSS - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (Other.4503.1998 / 4776840) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BRONIS, BARBARA W; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote; Result: CASE HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO OBJECTION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 11/04/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN VTR/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BRONIS, BARBARA W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - GRANTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketEACH DEFT OVER 5 CIR CIV ASSESSED $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/18/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001398

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS CIR CIV ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketOTHER CIVIL FILING ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less