This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 03/21/2020 at 21:33:19 (UTC).

BESITAN, JEZEBEL vs. CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 BESITAN, JEZEBEL filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CYPRESS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1805

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BESITAN, JEZEBEL

Defendant

CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUBOFF, KENNETH ROBERT

Defendant Attorneys

VALDES-ORTIZ, HECTOR E

TORRES, ANNA DORKAS

 

Court Documents

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

3/17/2020: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

3/9/2020: ORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

2/26/2020: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

2/25/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

2/21/2020: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

COMPLAINT-AMENDED ( V )

1/13/2020: COMPLAINT-AMENDED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

9/18/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

9/18/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

9/18/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

9/18/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

9/18/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

9/18/2019: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/18/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

9/18/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ATTORNEY: TORRES, ANNA DORKAS ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-AMENDED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: DUBOFF, KENNETH ROBERT - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA001805, BESITAN, JEZEBEL VS. CYPRESS PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-9/18/2019"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000077314; Applied Amount; $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: DUBOFF, KENNETH ROBERT ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/18/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA001805

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019000077314 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 95877523 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20190918235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less