Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/19/2021 at 03:23:26 (UTC).

BERNSTEIN, JOHN STAT vs. PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 BERNSTEIN, JOHN STAT filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0625

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BERNSTEIN, JOHN STAT

PAZ, MARCELINO

PAZ, DINORAH

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERNSTEIN, JOHN STAT

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

4/7/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS ISSUED

4/6/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

4/5/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

4/5/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

4/5/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

4/5/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

4/5/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/5/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

4/5/2021: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2021000027375; Applied Amount; $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: JOHN S BERNSTEIN - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CA000625, BERNSTEIN, JOHN STAT VS. PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-4/6/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BUCHANAN, LAURIE E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: BERNSTEIN, JOHN STAT ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 04/05/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CA000625

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021000027375 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 124301960 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20210405235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bernstein, John Stat