Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/16/2021 at 04:39:09 (UTC).

BEACH CLUB PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC vs. DOWNTON, PHYLLIS J EST

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 BEACH CLUB PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DOWNTON, PHYLLIS J EST. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0355

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEACH CLUB PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

DOWNTON, PHYLLIS J EST

DOWNTON, GEOFFREY

COURTNEY, CYRIL

DOWNTON, NEIL

UNKNOWN PARTIES AS TO PHYILLS J DOWNTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARLETON, MICHAEL E

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN/ADMINISTRATOR/ OR ATTORNEY AD LITEM ( V )

3/31/2021: MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN/ADMINISTRATOR/ OR ATTORNEY AD LITEM ( V )

SUGGESTION OF DEATH ( V )

3/11/2021: SUGGESTION OF DEATH ( V )

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (Other.4565.2979 / 4827276) ( V )

3/5/2021: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (Other.4565.2979 / 4827276) ( V )

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

3/2/2021: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

2/25/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

2/25/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

2/25/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

2/25/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

2/25/2021: COMPLAINT ( V )

VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

2/25/2021: VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

2/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN/ADMINISTRATOR/ OR ATTORNEY AD LITEM ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUGGESTION OF DEATH ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2021000017814; Applied Amount; $9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (Other.4565.2979 / 4827276) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $9.00 RECEIPT #2021000017814 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 122351149 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20210304235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2021000015547; Applied Amount; $431.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: CARLETON, MICHAEL E - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CA000355, BEACH CLUB PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC VS. DOWNTON, PHYLLIS J EST - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-2/25/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: CARLETON, MICHAEL E ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE METZGER, ELIZABETH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/25/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CA000355

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $431.00 RECEIPT #2021000015547 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 122042472 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20210225235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEACH CLUB PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARLETON, MICHAEL E